Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola de Angelis, C.F.I.C.

Bishop Emeritus of Peterborough, Ontario


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1939 BornPozzaglia Sabino, Italy
6 Dec 197031.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregazione dei Figli dell’Immacolata Concezione
27 Apr 199253.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
27 Apr 199253.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Remesiana
24 Jun 199253.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Remesiana
28 Dec 200263.9AppointedBishop of Peterborough, Ontario, Canada
8 Apr 201475.2RetiredBishop of Peterborough, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Nicola de Angelis:
Bishop Nicola de Angelis C.F.I.C. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Peterborough

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Peterborough.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,686
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Apr 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015