Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michael Mulhall

Archbishop of Kingston, Ontario, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1962 Born
21 Jul 198927.4Ordained PriestPriest of Peterborough, Ontario, Canada
30 Jun 200745.3AppointedBishop of Pembroke, Ontario, Canada
21 Sep 200745.5Ordained BishopBishop of Pembroke, Ontario, Canada
28 Mar 201957.0AppointedArchbishop of Kingston, Ontario, Canada
3 May 201957.1InstalledArchbishop of Kingston, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Michael Mulhall
Archbishop Michael Mulhall (born ) Archbishop of Kingston

EventPlace
Birth PlacePeterborough, Diocese of Peterborough, Ontario
Ordained BishopSaint Columbkille, Cathedral, Pembroke, Diocese of Pembroke, Ontario

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Kingston.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Jun 2007
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,514
  • op: Website of the Diocese, 8 Jul 2014
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Mar 2019
  • i: CB, 29 Mar 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 30 Mar 2019

Quantcast