Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Peterborough

Dioecesis Peterboroughensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • William Terrence McGrattan, Bishop
  • Nicola de Angelis, C.F.I.C., Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 11 July 1882
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Kingston
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Province: Ontario
  • Country: Canada
  • Square Kilometers: 25,890 (10,000 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Ontario
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: Pet
  • Official Web Site: http://www.peterboroughdiocese.org/
  • Mailing Address: 350 Hunter St. West, P.O. Box 175, Peterborough, Ontario K9J 6Y8, Canada
  • Telephone: (705)745-5123
  • Fax: 745-2555

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Canada
25 January 1874ErectedDiocese of Kingston Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Canada (erected)
Diocese of Peterborough
11 July 1882Name ChangedDiocese of Kingston (Peterborough, Northumberland, Durham, and Victoria Counties)
Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Canada (Muskoka and Parry Sound Districts)
Diocese of Peterborough
16 September 1904Territory LostDiocese of Peterborough Diocese of Sault Sainte Marie (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Peterborough
195030,00053659508629030ap1951
196641,417244,27017.0%56561678722732ap1967
197044,178262,00016.9%58462712519033ap1971
197634,700283,37612.2%488566191018533ap1977
198050,200294,00017.1%58563796616635ap1981
199071,181339,00021.0%934977335715140ap1991
199988,680387,89922.9%8769395310712142ap2000
200084,680389,89921.7%861096882111111042ap2001
200185,101391,50121.7%8489292513910143ap2002
200286,101401,12021.5%7898798912109543ap2003
200386,199395,62221.8%82109293612129542ap2004
200499,785396,62225.2%8010901,10811106541ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 8 Jul 2014