Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Joseph Miehm

Bishop of Peterborough, Ontario, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1960 Born
6 May 198928.6Ordained PriestPriest of Hamilton, Ontario, Canada
20 Feb 201352.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Hamilton, Ontario, Canada
20 Feb 201352.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Gor
7 May 201352.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gor
10 Mar 201756.5AppointedBishop of Peterborough, Ontario, Canada
19 Apr 201756.6InstalledBishop of Peterborough, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Daniel Joseph Miehm
Bishop Daniel Joseph Miehm (born ) Bishop of Peterborough

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKitchner

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Peterborough.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Feb 2013
  • ob: CB, 24 Feb 2013
  • c2+: CB, 4 May 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,785
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Mar 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Mar 2017