Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Edmonton

Archidioecesis Edmontonensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Richard William Smith, Archbishop
  • Gregory John Bittman, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Joseph Neil MacNeil, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Name Changed: 30 November 1912
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Province: Alberta
  • Country: Canada
  • Square Kilometers: 81,151 (31,344 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: West (Ouest)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: Edm
  • Official Web Site: http://www.caedm.ca/
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Pastoral Centre, 8421-101st. Ave., Edmonton, Alberta T6A 0L1, Canada
  • Telephone: (780)469-1010
  • Fax: 465-3003

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Saint Albert
22 September 1871ErectedDiocese of Saint-Boniface Diocese of Saint Albert (erected)
30 November 1912Territory LostDiocese of Saint Albert Diocese of Calgary (erected)
Archdiocese of Edmonton
30 November 1912Name ChangedDiocese of Saint Albert Archdiocese of Edmonton (Name Changed and Diocese raised to an Archdiocese)
17 July 1948Territory LostArchdiocese of Edmonton Diocese of Saint Paul in Alberta (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Edmonton
195062,150310,00020.0%1126017236166440172ap1951
1966132,845825,29116.1%1361082445449563290ap1967
1970136,000776,04517.5%11610622261214573888ap1971
1976152,000847,00017.9%112107219694167643183ap1977
1980161,000900,00017.9%105115220731168616176ap1981
1990255,0001,053,00024.2%931182111,208166545175ap1991
1999294,9351,204,61924.5%841151991,482162439159ap2000
2000294,9351,204,61924.5%821192011,467167425156ap2001
2001294,9351,204,61924.5%781161941,5201159415152ap2002
2002294,9351,204,61924.5%791101891,5601143404144ap2003
2003294,9351,204,61924.5%841011851,594131394141ap2004
2004341,5451,365,42825.0%79901692,0201111376140ap2005
2006353,5451,439,57224.6%91841752,0201105344135ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 9 Oct 2013