Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Terrio

Bishop of Saint Paul in Alberta, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1943 Born
23 May 197027.0Ordained PriestPriest of Montréal, Québec, Canada
2001²57.6IncardinatedPriest of Edmonton, Alberta, Canada
18 Oct 201269.4AppointedBishop of Saint Paul in Alberta, Canada
12 Dec 201269.6Ordained BishopBishop of Saint Paul in Alberta, Canada

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paul Terrio
Bishop Paul Terrio (born ) Bishop of Saint Paul in Alberta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontréal, Archdiocese of Montréal, Québec
Ordained BishopSaint Paul, Cathedral, Saint Paul, Diocese of Saint Paul in Alberta

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Saint Paul in Alberta.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Oct 2012
  • ob/c2: CB, 18 Oct 2012
  • c34: CB, 20 Oct 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,613

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 14 Aug 2018

Quantcast