Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Luc André Bouchard

Bishop of Trois Rivières, Québec


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1948 BornCornwall
4 Sep 197627.8Ordained PriestPriest of Alexandria-Cornwall, Ontario, Canada
8 Sep 200152.8AppointedBishop of Saint Paul in Alberta, Canada
9 Nov 200153.0Ordained BishopBishop of Saint Paul in Alberta, Canada
2 Feb 201263.2AppointedBishop of Trois Rivières, Québec, Canada
26 Mar 201263.4InstalledBishop of Trois Rivières, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Joseph Luc André Bouchard:
Bishop Joseph Luc André Bouchard (born ) Bishop of Trois Rivières

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Trois Rivières.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Number 14,073

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013