Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugène Philippe LaRocque

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Alexandria-Cornwall, Ontario, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1927Born
7 Jun 195225.1Ordained PriestPriest of London, Ontario, Canada
24 Jun 197447.2AppointedBishop of Alexandria in Ontario, Canada
3 Sep 197447.4Ordained BishopBishop of Alexandria in Ontario, Canada
15 Sep 197447.4InstalledBishop of Alexandria in Ontario, Canada
27 Apr 200275.0RetiredBishop of Alexandria-Cornwall, Ontario, Canada
16 Dec 201891.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Alexandria-Cornwall, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Eugène Philippe LaRocque
Bishop Eugène Philippe LaRocque (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Alexandria-Cornwall

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWindsor
Death PlaceWindsor

  • a priest for 66.5 years
  • a bishop for 44.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 171, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • opd: CB, 8 Apr 2016
  • d: CB, 17 Dec 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 19 Dec 2018

Quantcast