Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Paul-Émile Cardinal Léger, P.S.S. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Montréal, Québec, Canada

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Apr 1904Born
25 May 192925.0Ordained PriestPriest of Montréal, Québec, Canada
25 Mar 195045.9AppointedArchbishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada
26 Apr 195046.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada
12 Jan 195348.7Elevated to Cardinal
12 Jan 195348.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli
20 Apr 196863.9ResignedArchbishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada
13 Nov 199187.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Montréal, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Paul-Émile Léger (VIAF: 32036433)
Paul-Émile Cardinal Léger P.S.S. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Montréal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSalaberry-de-Valleyfield
Buried Place (Original)Mary, Queen of the World, Cathedral, Montréal, Archdiocese of Montréal, Québec

  • a priest for 62.4 years
  • a bishop for 41.5 years
  • a cardinal for 38.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 24
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 293, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 11 Apr 2019

Quantcast