Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Edward Power

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Antigonish, Nova Scotia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1915BornMontréal
7 Jun 194125.7Ordained PriestPriest of Montréal, Québec, Canada
12 May 196044.6AppointedBishop of Antigonish, Nova Scotia, Canada
20 Jul 196044.8Ordained BishopBishop of Antigonish, Nova Scotia, Canada
10 Aug 196044.9InstalledBishop of Antigonish, Nova Scotia, Canada
12 Dec 198671.2ResignedBishop of Antigonish, Nova Scotia, Canada
29 Nov 200388.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Antigonish, Nova Scotia, Canada

MicroData Summary for William Edward Power:
Bishop William Edward Power (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Antigonish

  • a priest for 62.5 years
  • a bishop for 43.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 79
  • r: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2003, Page 43
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 13 Nov 2014