Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Vernon Fougère

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Charlottetown, Prince Edward Island


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1943BornPetit-de-Grat
31 May 196926.0Ordained PriestPriest
11 Dec 199148.6AppointedBishop of Charlottetown, Prince Edward Island, Canada
19 Mar 199248.8Ordained BishopBishop of Charlottetown, Prince Edward Island, Canada
11 Jul 200966.1ResignedBishop of Charlottetown, Prince Edward Island, Canada
18 Jun 201370.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Charlottetown, Prince Edward Island, Canada

MicroData Summary for Joseph Vernon Fougère:
Bishop Joseph Vernon Fougère (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Charlottetown

  • a priest for 44.0 years
  • a bishop for 21.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Jul 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Number 11,619
  • d: CB, 20 Jun 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013