Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Austin-Emile Burke

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Halifax, Nova Scotia


from the Official Web Site of the Archdiocese

Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1922BornSluice Point
25 Mar 195028.1Ordained PriestPriest of Halifax, Nova Scotia, Canada
1 Feb 196846.0AppointedBishop of Yarmouth, Nova Scotia, Canada
14 May 196846.3Ordained BishopBishop of Yarmouth, Nova Scotia, Canada
8 Jul 199169.4AppointedArchbishop of Halifax, Nova Scotia, Canada
19 Sep 199169.6InstalledArchbishop of Halifax, Nova Scotia, Canada
13 Jan 199875.9RetiredArchbishop of Halifax, Nova Scotia, Canada
12 Aug 201189.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Halifax, Nova Scotia, Canada

MicroData Summary for Austin-Emile Burke:
Archbishop Austin-Emile Burke (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Halifax

  • a priest for 61.3 years
  • a bishop for 43.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 14 Aug 2011
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015