Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Saint John, New Brunswick

Dioecesis Sancti Ioannis Canadensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Robert Harris, Bishop
  • Joseph Edward Troy, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 15 November 1924
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Moncton
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Province: New Brunswick
  • Country: Canada
  • Square Kilometers: 60,000 (23,175 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Atlantic (Atlantique)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: SJNB
  • Official Web Site: http://www.dioceseofsaintjohn.org/
  • Mailing Address: Chancery Office, 1 Bayard Dr., Saint John, NB E2L 3L5, Canada
  • Telephone: (506)653-6800
  • Fax: 653-6812

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Saint John in America
30 September 1842ErectedArchdiocese of Québec Diocese of Saint John in America (erected)
8 May 1860Territory LostDiocese of Saint John in America Diocese of Chatham (erected)
Diocese of Saint John, New Brunswick
15 November 1924Name ChangedDiocese of Saint John in America Diocese of Saint John, New Brunswick
22 February 1936Territory LostDiocese of Chatham
Diocese of Saint John, New Brunswick
Archdiocese of Moncton (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Saint John, New Brunswick
195041,000198,50020.7%5716735611927730ap1951
196666,000275,00024.0%97131106001732151ap1967
196866,000275,00024.0%92181106002429049ap1971
197675,000275,00027.3%84231077002925050ap1977
198092,600283,00032.7%80179795411923554ap1981
199098,000280,00035.0%8014941,04221520559ap1991
1999112,710280,00040.3%679761,48321117058ap2000
2000112,710280,00040.3%659741,52321016558ap2001
2001112,710280,00040.3%6513781,44521417058ap2002
2002112,710280,00040.3%7014841,34121516758ap2003
2003112,710280,00040.3%6814821,37421516458ap2004
2004112,710280,00040.3%6313761,48321413958ap2005
2010118,000395,00029.9%614651,8153411059ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.2, 22 Oct 2012; data: 10 Dec 2012