Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Edward Troy

Bishop Emeritus of Saint John, New Brunswick, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1931 Born
28 May 195927.7Ordained PriestPriest of Bathurst in Canada, New Brunswick
1 Mar 198452.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Saint John, New Brunswick, Canada
22 May 198452.7Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Saint John, New Brunswick, Canada
2 Apr 198654.5SucceededBishop of Saint John, New Brunswick, Canada
24 Sep 199766.0ResignedBishop of Saint John, New Brunswick, Canada

MicroData Summary for Joseph Edward Troy
Bishop Joseph Edward Troy (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint John, New Brunswick

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChatham
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Saint John, Diocese of Saint John, New Brunswick

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Saint John, New Brunswick.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 86, Number 7,207

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast