Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edgar Godin

Deceased

Bishop of Bathurst in Canada, New Brunswick


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1911Born
15 Jun 194130.0Ordained PriestPriest of Bathurst in Canada, New Brunswick
9 Jun 196958.0AppointedBishop of Bathurst in Canada, New Brunswick
25 Jul 196958.1Ordained BishopBishop of Bathurst in Canada, New Brunswick
6 Apr 198573.8DiedBishop of Bathurst in Canada, New Brunswick

MicroData Summary for Edgar Godin
Bishop Edgar Godin (born , died ) Bishop of Bathurst in Canada

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNéguac
Ordained BishopSacred Heart, Cathedral, Bathurst, Diocese of Bathurst in Canada, New Brunswick

  • a priest for 43.8 years
  • a bishop for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 374

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast