Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Timothy Casey

Deceased

Archbishop of Vancouver, British Columbia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1862BornCharlotte Coventry
29 Jun 188624.4Ordained PriestPriest of Saint John in America, New Brunswick, Canada
30 Sep 189937.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Saint John in America, New Brunswick, Canada
30 Sep 189937.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Uthina
11 Feb 190038.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Uthina
25 Mar 190139.1SucceededBishop of Saint John in America, New Brunswick, Canada
31 Jul 191250.4AppointedArchbishop of Vancouver, British Columbia, Canada
5 Oct 193169.6DiedArchbishop of Vancouver, British Columbia, Canada

MicroData Summary for Timothy Casey:
Archbishop Timothy Casey (born , died ) Archbishop of Vancouver

  • a priest for 45.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 322, and Page 577

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013