Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop James Morrison

Deceased

Bishop of Antigonish, Nova Scotia, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1861Born
1 Nov 188928.3Ordained PriestPriest of Antigonish, Nova Scotia, Canada
15 May 191250.8AppointedBishop of Antigonish, Nova Scotia, Canada
4 Sep 191251.1Ordained BishopBishop of Antigonish, Nova Scotia, Canada
26 Feb 194482.6AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Antigonish, Nova Scotia, Canada
13 Apr 195088.7DiedBishop of Antigonish, Nova Scotia, Canada

MicroData Summary for James Morrison
Archbishop James Morrison (born , died ) Bishop of Antigonish

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSavage Harbour
Ordained PriestUrban College de Propaganda Fide, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSt. Ninian, Cathedral, Antigonish, Diocese of Antigonish, Nova Scotia
Death PlaceAntigonish, Diocese of Antigonish, Nova Scotia
Buried Place (Original)St. Ninian, Cemetery, Antigonish, Diocese of Antigonish, Nova Scotia

  • a priest for 60.4 years
  • a bishop for 37.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1912, Number 58
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 58
  • c1/loc: CB, 10 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 13 Apr 2019

Quantcast