Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Henry Joseph O’Leary

Deceased

Archbishop of Edmonton, Alberta, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1879Born
21 Sep 190122.5Ordained PriestPriest of Chatham, New Brunswick, Canada
29 Jan 191333.8AppointedBishop of Charlottetown, Prince Edward Island, Canada
22 May 191334.1Ordained BishopBishop of Charlottetown, Prince Edward Island, Canada
7 Sep 192041.4AppointedArchbishop of Edmonton, Alberta, Canada
8 Oct 192041.5InstalledArchbishop of Edmonton, Alberta, Canada
5 Mar 193858.9DiedArchbishop of Edmonton, Alberta, Canada

MicroData Summary for Henry Joseph O’Leary
Archbishop Henry Joseph O’Leary (born , died ) Archbishop of Edmonton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRichibouctou
Ordained BishopSacred Heart, Church, Bathurst, Diocese of Chatham, New Brunswick
Death PlaceSaint Joseph, Hospital, Victoria
Buried Place (Original)St. Joachim, Cemetery, Edmonton, Archdiocese of Edmonton, Alberta

  • a priest for 36.4 years
  • a bishop for 24.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1913, Number 25
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 43
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 7, Number 353, Ascendance
  • c1/loc: CB, 12 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 13 Apr 2019

Quantcast