Catholic-Hierarchy DC

James Charles Cardinal McGuigan

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Toronto, Ontario

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1894BornHunter River
26 May 191823.5Ordained PriestPriest of Edmonton, Alberta, Canada
30 Jan 193035.1AppointedArchbishop of Regina, Saskatchewan, Canada
15 May 193035.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Regina, Saskatchewan, Canada
21 May 193035.4InstalledArchbishop of Regina, Saskatchewan, Canada
22 Dec 193440.0AppointedArchbishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
18 Feb 194651.2Elevated to Cardinal
18 Feb 194651.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo
30 Mar 197176.3RetiredArchbishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
8 Apr 197479.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Toronto, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for James Charles McGuigan:
James Charles Cardinal McGuigan (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Toronto

  • a priest for 55.8 years
  • a bishop for 43.8 years
  • a cardinal for 28.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1930, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 1 Jun 2015