Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paul Bernier

Deceased

Bishop of Gaspé, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1906Born
17 Jun 192822.4Ordained PriestPriest of Québec, Canada
7 Aug 195246.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Laodicea in Syria
7 Aug 195246.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Costa Rica
7 Aug 195246.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Panama
12 Sep 195246.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Laodicea in Syria
21 May 195549.3ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Costa Rica
9 Sep 195751.6AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Gaspé, Québec, Canada
21 Nov 196458.8DiedBishop of Gaspé, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Paul Bernier (VIAF: 104021449)
Archbishop Paul Bernier (born , died ) Bishop of Gaspé

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQuébec, Archdiocese of Québec
Ordained PriestArchbishop's Residence, Chapel, Québec, Archdiocese of Québec
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame de Québec, Basilica, Québec, Archdiocese of Québec
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Cemetery, Gaspé, Diocese of Gaspé, Québec

  • a priest for 36.4 years
  • a bishop for 12.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 81
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 106, and Page 195
  • c1/loc: CB, 14 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 15 Apr 2019

Quantcast