Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Rubén Odio Herrera

Deceased

Archbishop of San José de Costa Rica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Oct 1901BornSan Jose
29 Jun 192422.7Ordained PriestPriest of San José de Costa Rica
31 Oct 195251.0AppointedArchbishop of San José de Costa Rica
12 Dec 195251.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of San José de Costa Rica
21 Aug 195957.8DiedArchbishop of San José de Costa Rica

MicroData Summary for Rubén Odio Herrera:
Archbishop Rubén Odio Herrera (born , died ) Archbishop of San José de Costa Rica

  • a priest for 35.1 years
  • a bishop for 6.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1955
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 113

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013