Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso Hoefer (Höfer) Hombach, C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Limón

Titular Bishop of Thebae Phthiotides


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1911BornKöln, Germany
18 Dec 193726.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
7 Jan 195846.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Limón, Costa Rica
7 Jan 195846.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Thebae Phthiotides
11 Apr 195846.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thebae Phthiotides
15 Nov 197968.5ResignedVicar Apostolic of Limón, Costa Rica
15 Dec 198978.5DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Limón, Costa Rica

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Hoefer (Höfer) Hombach:
Bishop Alfonso Hoefer (Höfer) Hombach C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Limón

  • a priest for 51.9 years
  • a bishop for 31.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015