Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Limón

Dioecesis Limonensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Limón
16 February 1921ErectedDiocese of San José de Costa Rica Vicariate Apostolic of Limón (erected)
Diocese of Limón
30 December 1994ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Limón Diocese of Limón
24 May 2005Territory LostDiocese of Limón
Archdiocese of San José de Costa Rica
Diocese of Cartago (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Limón
194960,10075,25079.9%110115,463116ap1951
1966120,000140,00085.7%59148,5719309ap1967
1970118,809134,95588.0%1910294,096103313ap1971
1976147,562167,56288.1%107178,68083115ap1977
1980152,350184,08282.8%910198,018213315ap1981
1990223,762265,55984.3%1612287,991124516ap1991
Diocese of Limón
1999319,857383,40283.4%2912417,801134219ap2000
2000326,000390,00083.6%337408,15084420ap2001
2001327,401409,25180.0%317388,61584220ap2002
2002327,401409,25180.0%346408,18574020ap2003
2003333,580427,66778.0%317388,77894920ap2004
2004348,591446,91278.0%306369,68374521ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 27 Aug 2013