Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karl Albert Wollgarten, C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Limón, Costa Rica

Titular Bishop of Chusira


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1897Born
28 Jan 193538.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Limón, Costa Rica
28 Jan 193538.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Chusira
1 May 193538.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chusira
28 Apr 193740.2DiedVicar Apostolic of Limón, Costa Rica

MicroData Summary for Karl Albert Wollgarten
Bishop Karl Albert Wollgarten C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Limón

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUnterrath, Germany

  • a bishop for 1.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018