Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of San José de Costa Rica

Archidioecesis Sancti Iosephi in Costarica



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 16 February 1921
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Costa Rica
  • Square Kilometers: 2,208 (852 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.arquisanjose.org/
  • Mailing Address: Arzobispado, Avenida Cuarta entre Calle Central y calle Primera, Apartado 497, 1000 San José, Costa Rica
  • Telephone: 2258-1015
  • Fax: 2221-2427

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of San José de Costa Rica
28 February 1850ErectedDiocese of Nicaragua Diocese of San José de Costa Rica (erected) (Costa Rica)
16 February 1921Territory LostDiocese of San José de Costa Rica Diocese of Alajuela (erected)
16 February 1921Territory LostDiocese of San José de Costa Rica Vicariate Apostolic of Limón (erected)
Archdiocese of San José de Costa Rica
16 February 1921ElevatedDiocese of San José de Costa Rica Archdiocese of San José de Costa Rica
19 August 1954Territory LostDiocese of Alajuela
Archdiocese of San José de Costa Rica
Diocese of San Isidro de El General (erected)
24 May 2005Territory LostDiocese of Limón
Archdiocese of San José de Costa Rica
Diocese of Cartago (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of San José de Costa Rica
1949449,000450,04899.8%71411124,0084128047ap1951
1966579,856597,85697.0%1091092182,65913566060ap1967
1970742,746757,90498.0%1301112413,08114172565ap1971
1976885,066903,12998.0%144922363,75014463172ap1977
1980800,000940,00085.1%1511102613,06512560283ap1981
19901,350,0001,500,00090.0%2151333483,879260630107ap1991
19992,334,6362,683,49087.0%2521163686,344241584120ap2000
20002,345,0362,726,78686.0%2701023726,303206535124ap2001
20012,347,6232,761,91085.0%289873766,243195526127ap2002
20022,375,0192,794,14085.0%272913636,542187522131ap2003
20031,812,9452,132,87785.0%273913644,980159522134ap2004
20041,621,8001,930,71484.0%2601353954,1051248616134ap2005
20101,168,0001,566,00074.6%241983393,4452241483107ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 16 Mar 2014