Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anselmo Llorente y La Fuente

Deceased

Bishop of San José de Costa Rica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1800³BornCartago
1825¹24.7Ordained PriestPriest
10 Apr 185151.0AppointedBishop of San José de Costa Rica
7 Sep 185151.4Ordained BishopBishop of San José de Costa Rica
8 Feb 185251.8InstalledBishop of San José de Costa Rica
23 Sep 187171.4DiedBishop of San José de Costa Rica

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Anselmo Llorente y La Fuente:
Bishop Anselmo Llorente y La Fuente (born , died ) Bishop of San José de Costa Rica

  • a priest for 46.7 years
  • a bishop for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 324

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013