Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan José de Aycinena y Piñol

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Guatemala

Titular Bishop of Traianopolis in Phrygia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1792Born
1818¹25.3Ordained PriestPriest of Guatemala
15 Apr 185966.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Guatemala
15 Apr 185966.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Traianopolis in Phrygia
21 Aug 185966.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Traianopolis in Phrygia
17 Feb 186572.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Guatemala

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan José de Aycinena y Piñol (VIAF: 8189943)
Bishop Juan José de Aycinena y Piñol (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Guatemala

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuatemala, Archdiocese of Guatemala
Ordained BishopGuatemala, Archdiocese of Guatemala

  • a priest for 47.1 years
  • a bishop for 5.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 560
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,859, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast