Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José María Barrutia y Croquer

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Guatemala

Titular Bishop of Camachus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Sep 1796Born
21 Dec 182731.2Ordained PriestPriest of Guatemala
15 Apr 185962.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Guatemala
15 Apr 185962.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Camachus
3 Jul 185962.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Camachus
23 Aug 186467.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Guatemala

MicroData Summary for José María Barrutia y Croquer
Bishop José María Barrutia y Croquer (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Guatemala

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuatemala, Archdiocese of Guatemala
Ordained BishopGuatemala, Archdiocese of Guatemala

  • a priest for 36.6 years
  • a bishop for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1864
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 174
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1859, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 Jan 2017