Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Félix de Jesús Zepeda, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Comayagua, Honduras


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1808Born
6 May 183223.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
15 Apr 185950.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Guatemala
15 Apr 185950.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Arindela
16 Oct 185950.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arindela
22 Jul 186152.6AppointedBishop of Comayagua, Honduras
20 Apr 188576.4DiedBishop of Comayagua, Honduras

MicroData Summary for Juan Félix de Jesús Zepeda (VIAF: 173196804)
Bishop Juan Félix de Jesús Zepeda O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Bishop of Comayagua

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTatumbla, Diocese of San Salvador, El Salvador, El Salvador
Ordained BishopSan Francisco, Guatemala, Archdiocese of Guatemala

  • a priest for 52.9 years
  • a bishop for 25.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 122, and Page 218
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1859, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 Jan 2017