Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Claudio María Volio y Jiménez

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Santa Rosa de Copán, Honduras

Titular Archbishop of Soteropolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1874Born
17 Dec 189824.1Ordained PriestPriest of San José de Costa Rica
2 Feb 191641.2AppointedBishop of Santa Rosa de Copán, Honduras
26 May 191641.5Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Rosa de Copán, Honduras
8 Mar 191843.3InstalledBishop of Santa Rosa de Copán, Honduras
12 Nov 192652.0ResignedBishop of Santa Rosa de Copán, Honduras
12 Nov 192652.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Laranda
18 Apr 194065.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Soteropolis
19 Jan 194570.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Santa Rosa de Copán, Honduras

MicroData Summary for Claudio María Volio y Jiménez
Archbishop Claudio María Volio y Jiménez (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Santa Rosa de Copán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCartago, Costa Rica

  • a priest for 46.0 years
  • a bishop for 28.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1916, Number 22
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 322

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast