Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Cesare Roncetti

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to Bavaria

Titular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1834Born
26 Jun 187642.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria
16 Jul 187642.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria
18 Jul 187642.5AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Brazil
28 Jul 187945.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bavaria
13 Oct 188147.7DiedApostolic Nuncio to Bavaria

MicroData Summary for Cesare Roncetti (VIAF: 30713426)
Archbishop Cesare Roncetti (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio of Bavaria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSant'Apolinaire, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 511
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1876, Number 52
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 56, and Page 57, and Page 78

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast