Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antônio Maria Corrêa de Sá e Benevides

Deceased

Bishop of Mariana, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1836Born
11 Dec 186428.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
17 Dec 186428.8Ordained PriestPriest
30 Aug 187640.5SelectedBishop of Goiás, Brazil
18 Dec 187640.8ConfirmedBishop of Goiás, Brazil
24 Apr 187741.1SelectedBishop of Mariana, Brazil
25 Jun 187741.3ConfirmedBishop of Mariana, Brazil
9 Sep 187741.5Ordained BishopBishop of Mariana, Brazil
15 Jul 189660.3DiedBishop of Mariana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Antônio Maria Corrêa de Sá e Benevides
Bishop Antônio Maria Corrêa de Sá e Benevides (born , died ) Bishop of Mariana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCampos
Ordained BishopBenedictine, Monastery, Rio de Janeiro, Diocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

  • a priest for 31.5 years
  • a bishop for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 288, and Page 367
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1877, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017