Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Cláudio José Gonçalves Ponce de Leão, C.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

Titular Archbishop of Anazarbus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1841Born
22 Dec 186625.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of the Mission
15 Jun 186726.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
5 Mar 188140.0SelectedBishop of Goiás, Brazil
13 May 188140.2ConfirmedBishop of Goiás, Brazil
24 Jul 188140.4Ordained BishopBishop of Goiás, Brazil
26 Jun 189049.3AppointedBishop of São Pedro do Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
15 Aug 191069.4AppointedArchbishop of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
9 Jan 191270.8ResignedArchbishop of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
9 Jan 191270.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Anazarbus
27 May 192483.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Cláudio José Gonçalves Ponce de Leão (VIAF: 81535231)
Archbishop Cláudio José Gonçalves Ponce de Leão C.M. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Porto Alegre

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBahia
Ordained BishopSao Benito, Rio de Janeiro, Diocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

  • a priest for 56.9 years
  • a bishop for 42.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 288, and Page 450
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 53
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1881, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017