Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Maria de Lacerda

Deceased

Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1830Born
5 Jun 185222.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
10 Aug 185222.5Ordained PriestPriest of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
24 Sep 186838.6AppointedBishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
10 Jan 186938.9Ordained BishopBishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
12 Nov 189060.7DiedBishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Pedro Maria de Lacerda (VIAF: 68220644)
Bishop Pedro Maria de Lacerda (born , died ) Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRio de Janeiro, Diocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro
Ordained BishopNossa Senhora Assuncao, Cathedral, Mariana, Diocese of Mariana

  • a priest for 38.2 years
  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 507
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,029
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1869, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017