Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Silvério Gomes Pimenta

Deceased

Archbishop of Mariana, Minas Gerais, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1840Born
21 Apr 186222.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Mariana, Brazil
20 Jul 186222.5Ordained PriestPriest of Mariana, Brazil
26 Jun 189050.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mariana, Brazil
26 Jun 189050.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Camachus
31 Aug 189050.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Camachus
3 Dec 189656.8AppointedBishop of Mariana, Brazil
1 May 190666.3AppointedArchbishop of Mariana, Minas Gerais, Brazil
30 Aug 192282.6DiedArchbishop of Mariana, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Silvério Gomes Pimenta (VIAF: 284452492)
Archbishop Silvério Gomes Pimenta (born , died ) Archbishop of Mariana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCongonhas do Campo, Diocese of Mariana
Ordained BishopSeminary, Chapel, São Paulo, Diocese of São Paulo

  • a priest for 60.1 years
  • a bishop for 31.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 175, and Page 367
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 May 2017