Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antônio José dos Santos, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Assis, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1872Born
9 Jun 190027.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
13 Dec 191846.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Diamantina, Minas Gerais, Brazil
13 Dec 191846.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Croae
19 Oct 191946.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Croae
22 Nov 192956.9AppointedBishop of Assis, Sao Paulo, Brazil
1 Feb 195683.1DiedBishop of Assis, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Antônio José dos Santos
Archbishop Antônio José dos Santos C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Assis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCachoeira do Campo

  • a priest for 55.6 years
  • a bishop for 36.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,919, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast