Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Nunes Coelho

Deceased

Bishop of Luz, Minas Gerais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1884BornVirginopolis
7 Apr 190723.2Ordained PriestPriest of Diamantina, Minas Gerais, Brazil
10 Jun 192036.3AppointedBishop of Aterrado, Brazil
14 Nov 192036.8Ordained BishopBishop of Aterrado, Brazil
8 Jul 196783.4DiedBishop of Luz, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Manuel Nunes Coelho:
Bishop Manuel Nunes Coelho (born , died ) Bishop of Luz

  • a priest for 60.3 years
  • a bishop for 46.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1920, Number 68
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 70

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013