Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alexandre Gonçalves do Amaral

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Uberaba, Minas Gerais, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1906Born
22 Sep 192923.2Ordained PriestPriest of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais, Brazil
5 Aug 193933.1AppointedBishop of Uberaba, Brazil
29 Oct 193933.3Ordained BishopBishop of Uberaba, Brazil
14 Apr 196255.8AppointedArchbishop of Uberaba, Minas Gerais, Brazil
14 Jul 197872.0ResignedArchbishop of Uberaba, Minas Gerais, Brazil
5 Feb 200295.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Uberaba, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Alexandre Gonçalves do Amaral
Archbishop Alexandre Gonçalves do Amaral (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Uberaba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarmo da Mata

  • a priest for 72.3 years
  • a bishop for 62.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1939, Number 69

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018