Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Geraldo Ferreira Reis

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Leopoldina, Minas Gerais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1911BornAlpinópolis
21 Jun 193624.7Ordained PriestPriest of Guaxupé, Minas Gerais, Brazil
16 Jun 196149.7AppointedBishop of Leopoldina, Minas Gerais, Brazil
24 Aug 196149.9Ordained BishopBishop of Leopoldina, Minas Gerais, Brazil
5 Aug 198573.8RetiredBishop of Leopoldina, Minas Gerais, Brazil
22 Jun 199583.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Leopoldina, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Geraldo Ferreira Reis:
Bishop Geraldo Ferreira Reis (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Leopoldina

  • a priest for 59.0 years
  • a bishop for 33.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013