Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcos Antônio Noronha

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Itabira


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Sep 1924BornAreado
7 Dec 194723.2Ordained PriestPriest
7 Jul 196540.8AppointedBishop of Itabira, Brazil
24 Aug 196540.9Ordained BishopBishop of Itabira, Brazil
7 Nov 197046.1ResignedBishop of Itabira, Brazil
16 Feb 199873.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Itabira, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Marcos Antônio Noronha:
Bishop Marcos Antônio Noronha (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Itabira

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 32.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/r/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013