Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José de Almeida Batista Pereira

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Guaxupé, Minas Gerais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1917BornSão Gonçalo
22 Dec 194023.4Ordained PriestPriest of Niterói (Nictheroy), Brazil
22 Dec 195336.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Niterói (Nictheroy), Brazil
22 Dec 195336.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Baris in Pisidia
2 Feb 195436.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Baris in Pisidia
7 Nov 195538.3AppointedBishop of Sete Lagoas, Minas Gerais, Brazil
2 Apr 196446.7AppointedBishop of Guaxupé, Minas Gerais, Brazil
16 Jan 197658.5ResignedBishop of Guaxupé, Minas Gerais, Brazil
30 Jan 200991.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Guaxupé, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José de Almeida Batista Pereira:
Bishop José de Almeida Batista Pereira (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Guaxupé

  • a priest for 68.1 years
  • a bishop for 55.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013