Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Hugo Bressane de Araújo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Marília, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1899BornMachado
11 Feb 192323.4Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 193536.3AppointedBishop of Bonfim, Bahia, Brazil
16 Feb 193636.4Ordained BishopBishop of Bonfim, Bahia, Brazil
19 Sep 194041.0AppointedBishop of Guaxupé, Minas Gerais, Brazil
3 Sep 195152.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais, Brazil
3 Sep 195152.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cotrada
7 Oct 195455.1AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Marília, Sao Paulo, Brazil
23 Apr 197575.6RetiredBishop of Marília, Sao Paulo, Brazil
9 Jun 198888.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Marília, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Hugo Bressane de Araújo:
Archbishop Hugo Bressane de Araújo (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Marília

  • a priest for 65.3 years
  • a bishop for 52.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1936, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 9 Jun 2014