Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Bonfim

Dioecesis Bonfimensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 6 April 1933
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Feira de Santana
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Baia
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 34,600 (13,364 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Nordeste III
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesedebonfim.com.br/
  • Mailing Address: Rua Conego Hugo 96, 48970-000 Senhor do Bonfim, BA, Brazil
  • Telephone: (074)3541-1652
  • Fax: (same)

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
6 April 1933ErectedArchdiocese of São Salvador da Bahia Diocese of Bonfim (erected)
14 November 1959Territory LostDiocese of Barra (do Rio Grande)
Diocese of Bonfim
Diocese of Caetité
Archdiocese of São Salvador da Bahia
Diocese of Ruy Barbosa (Rui Barbosa) (erected)
14 September 1971Territory LostDiocese of Bonfim Diocese of Paulo Afonso (erected)
16 January 2002Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Bonfim (from Sao Salvador da Bahia)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950295,000325,00090.8%1462014,750181823ap1951
1959440,000450,00097.8%2062616,923132124ap1960
1966590,000599,31698.4%1872523,600174219ap1967
1968680,000700,00097.1%1582329,565187016ap1971
1976400,300425,51894.1%1061625,01885510ap1977
1980495,001526,03794.1%1091926,052106611ap1981
1990576,000611,15894.2%1141538,4001148314ap1991
1999665,200705,50094.3%5152033,2602246016ap2000
2000650,000700,00092.9%8182625,0002209716ap2001
2001605,000620,00097.6%13152821,6072248320ap2002
2002607,000624,00097.3%5141931,947176123ap2003
2003607,000624,00097.3%8142227,5902176723ap2004
2004561,941625,14889.9%14173118,1271207223ap2005
2006557,674616,81990.4%9162522,3062258024ap2007
2012596,000659,00090.4%21173815,684217524ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 9 Sep 2013