Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Feira de Santana

Archidioecesis Fori S. Annae



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Itamar Navildo Vian, O.F.M. Cap., Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 16 January 2002
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Baia
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 8,673 (3,349 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Nordeste III
  • Mailing Address: Curia Metropolitana, Av. Getulio Vargas 394, 44025-010 Feira de Santana; C.P. 276, 44001-970 Feira de Santana, BA, Brazil
  • Telephone: (075)3623-2875
  • Fax: (same)

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Feira de Santana
21 July 1962ErectedArchdiocese of São Salvador da Bahia Diocese of Feira de Santana (erected)
Archdiocese of Feira de Santana
16 January 2002ElevatedDiocese of Feira de Santana Archdiocese of Feira de Santana
21 September 2005Territory LostArchdiocese of Feira de Santana
Diocese of Paulo Afonso
Diocese of Serrinha (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Feira de Santana
19661913320153729ap1967
19682314370183220ap1971
1976750,000800,00093.8%23133620,8331193730ap1977
1980756,000840,00090.0%18102827,000124431ap1981
19901,065,0001,225,00086.9%23174026,62522210136ap1991
1999979,4211,126,13187.0%38215916,60052511840ap2000
2000979,9061,125,15187.1%42236515,07552612341ap2001
Archdiocese of Feira de Santana
2001981,1261,126,13187.1%44216515,09444212541ap2002
2002981,1331,126,13187.1%38256315,57342612742ap2003
2003982,7301,126,13187.3%41246515,11843112642ap2004
20041,045,4821,194,88287.5%37225917,72043114042ap2005
2006859,949960,03389.6%37165316,22542815037ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 28 May 2013