Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edgar Moreira da Cunha, S.D.V.

Bishop of Fall River, Massachusetts


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1953 BornRiachão do Jacuípe Bahia, Brazil
11 Feb 197521.4ProfessedMember of Society of Divine Vocations
11 Feb 197925.4Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Society of Divine Vocations
27 Mar 198228.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Divine Vocations
27 Jun 200349.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
27 Jun 200349.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Ucres
3 Sep 200350.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ucres
3 Jul 201460.8AppointedBishop of Fall River, Massachusetts, USA
24 Sep 201461.0InstalledBishop of Fall River, Massachusetts, USA

MicroData Summary for Edgar Moreira da Cunha:
Bishop Edgar Moreira da Cunha S.D.V. (born ) Bishop of Fall River

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Fall River.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,448
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Jul 2014
  • i: CB, 3 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015