Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Abel Francis, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Newark, New Jersey

Titular Bishop of Valliposita


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1923BornLafayette
7 Oct 195027.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
3 May 197652.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
3 May 197652.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Valliposita
25 Jun 197652.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Valliposita
30 Jun 199571.8RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
1 Sep 199773.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Abel Francis:
Bishop Joseph Abel Francis S.V.D. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Newark

  • a priest for 46.9 years
  • a bishop for 21.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 9 Jul 2014