Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arthur Joseph Serratelli

Bishop Emeritus of Paterson, New Jersey, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Apr 1944 Born
20 Dec 196824.6Ordained PriestPriest of Newark, New Jersey, USA
3 Jul 200056.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
3 Jul 200056.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Enera
8 Sep 200056.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Enera
1 Jun 200460.1AppointedBishop of Paterson, New Jersey, USA
6 Jul 200460.2InstalledBishop of Paterson, New Jersey, USA
15 Apr 202075.9RetiredBishop of Paterson, New Jersey, USA

MicroData Summary for Arthur Joseph Serratelli (VIAF: 1525768)
Bishop Arthur Joseph Serratelli (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Paterson

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNewark, Archdiocese of Newark, New Jersey
Ordained BishopSacred Heart, Cathedral Basilica, Newark, Archdiocese of Newark, New Jersey

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Paterson.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Number 13,831
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Apr 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 1 Jul 2020

Quantcast