Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Frederick Reh

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saginaw, Michigan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1911BornNew York, NY
8 Dec 193524.9Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
4 Jun 196251.4AppointedBishop of Charleston, South Carolina, USA
29 Jun 196251.5Ordained BishopBishop of Charleston, South Carolina, USA
18 Jul 196251.5InstalledBishop of Charleston, South Carolina, USA
5 Sep 196453.7AppointedRector of the Pontifical North American College
5 Sep 196453.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Macriana in Mauretania
11 Dec 196857.9AppointedBishop of Saginaw, Michigan, USA
29 Apr 198069.3ResignedBishop of Saginaw, Michigan, USA
14 Nov 199483.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Saginaw, Michigan, USA

MicroData Summary for Francis Frederick Reh:
Bishop Francis Frederick Reh (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saginaw

  • a priest for 58.9 years
  • a bishop for 32.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 93

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 6 Oct 2014