Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Victor Adamec

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Altoona-Johnstown, Pennsylvania, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1935Born
3 Jul 196024.8Ordained PriestPriest of Nitra, Slovakia
12 Mar 198751.5AppointedBishop of Altoona-Johnstown, Pennsylvania, USA
20 May 198751.7Ordained BishopBishop of Altoona-Johnstown, Pennsylvania, USA
14 Jan 201175.4RetiredBishop of Altoona-Johnstown, Pennsylvania, USA
20 Mar 201983.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Altoona-Johnstown, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Victor Adamec (VIAF: 2882153239460729450006)
Bishop Joseph Victor Adamec (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Altoona-Johnstown

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBannister, MI
Buried Place (Original)Crypt Chapel, Blessed Sacrament, Cathedral, Altoona, Diocese of Altoona-Johnstown, Pennsylvania

  • a priest for 58.7 years
  • a bishop for 31.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 14 Jan 2011
  • d: CB, 21 Mar 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 23 Mar 2019

Quantcast