Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mark Leonard Bartchak

Bishop of Altoona-Johnstown, Pennsylvania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1955 BornCleveland, OH
22 Sep 198025.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Erie, Pennsylvania, USA
15 May 198126.4Ordained PriestPriest of Erie, Pennsylvania, USA
14 Jan 201156.0AppointedBishop of Altoona-Johnstown, Pennsylvania, USA
19 Apr 201156.3Ordained BishopBishop of Altoona-Johnstown, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Mark Leonard Bartchak:
Bishop Mark Leonard Bartchak (born ) Bishop of Altoona-Johnstown

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Altoona-Johnstown.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Jan 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,040

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013